NJ S2557 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A212

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns stop-work orders related to prevailing wage and construction worker employment.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns stop-work orders related to prevailing wage and construction worker employment.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.158.
2019-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-3-1)
2019-05-23AssemblySubstituted for A108 (2R)
2019-02-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-01-31AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A108 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2557 (3R)
A212 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback