NJ A108 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A212
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2557 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2557 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns stop-work orders related to prevailing wage and construction worker employment.*
Title
Concerns stop-work orders related to prevailing wage and construction worker employment.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2557 (3R) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A212 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2557 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.158.
S2557 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.158.