NJ S2557 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3223
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A312 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A312 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Local Government Services to include certain property tax information on division's web page.
Title
Requires Division of Local Government Services to include certain property tax information on division's web page.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Senate | Substituted by A312 (1R) |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A312 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Approved P.L.2017, c.36.
A3223 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
A3223 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.