NJ S2551 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits real estate licensees to prepare broker price opinions and comparative market analyses.
Title
Permits real estate licensees to prepare broker price opinions and comparative market analyses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Rep. Linda Stender [D] | Sen. Kevin O'Toole [R] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Rep. Scott Rumana [R] |
Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3718 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3718 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3718 (1R) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Diegnan) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-2) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3718 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S2551 (1R)