NJ S2469 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1036
Note: Carry Foward to future A3115
Note: Carry Foward to future A3115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Title
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1115 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A1115 (ACS) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-12) |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Sweeney) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
A4116 (Same As) 2016-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1115 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2469 (2R)
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
A4116 (Same As) 2016-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1115 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2469 (2R)