NJ A1115 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2469 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2469 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.*
Title
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2469 (2R) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4162 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S400 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2469 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
S400 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2469 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)