NJ A3115 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1036
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1036
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Title
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S1036 |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1036 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.1.
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)