NJ S1036 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2469
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Title
Provides that AG handle investigation and prosecution of crime involving person's death by law enforcement officer while acting in officer's official capacity or while in custody; requires trial in venue outside county where incident occurred.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.1. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-34-1) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A3115 |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-11) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2469 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-21-0)
A3115 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1036
A3115 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1036