NJ S2454 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns prevailing wage requirements for certain fabrication.
Title
Concerns prevailing wage requirements for certain fabrication.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3964 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.44. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-4-1) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A3964 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-2) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3964 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2454