NJ S225 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2442
Note: Carry Over of previous A4755
Note: Carry Over of previous A4755
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.222.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.222.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that student-athlete who sustains concussion must return to regular school activities prior to return to competition; requires school districts to implement six-step return-to-competition process.
Title
Provides that student-athlete who sustains concussion must return to regular school activities prior to return to competition; requires school districts to implement six-step return-to-competition process.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A679 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A679 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.222. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A679 (1R) |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2442 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A679 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S225 (2R)
A4755 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A679 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S225 (2R)
A4755 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee