NJ S2442 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S225
Note: Carry Foward to future A679
Note: Carry Foward to future A679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that student-athlete who sustains concussion must return to regular school activities prior to return to competition; requires school districts to implement five-step return-to-competition process.
Title
Provides that student-athlete who sustains concussion must return to regular school activities prior to return to competition; requires school districts to implement five-step return-to-competition process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2442 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2442 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4755 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2442 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4755 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee