NJ S2160 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1046
Note: Carry Foward to future A3861
Note: Carry Foward to future A3861
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns unemployment compensation and labor disputes.
Title
Concerns unemployment compensation and labor disputes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3819 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-0) |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3819 |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2160 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S2160 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3819 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S2160
S2160 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3819 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S2160