NJ S1046 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3861 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3861 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns unemployment compensation and labor disputes.
Title
Concerns unemployment compensation and labor disputes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3861 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2160 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3861 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.83.
A3861 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.83.