NJ S2123 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Title
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3265 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3265 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3265 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2014, c.26. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A3265 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3265 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2123