NJ A3265 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-5)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S2123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Title
Authorizes New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust to expend certain sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2123 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2123 (Same As) 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.26.