NJ S2086 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.172.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Changes deadline for filing nominating petitions for school board candidates to last Monday in July; revises procedure for filling school board candidate vacancy; and revises certain other election procedures.*
Title
Changes deadline for filing nominating petitions for school board candidates to last Monday in July; revises procedure for filling school board candidate vacancy; and revises certain other election procedures.*
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3424 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3424 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-27 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.172. |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-1-0) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A3424 (1R) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3424 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2086 (1R)