NJ A3424 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2086 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2086 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes deadline for filing nominating petitions for school board candidates to last Monday in July; revises procedure for filing school board candidate vacancy; and revises certain other election procedures. *
Title
Changes deadline for filing nominating petitions for school board candidates to last Monday in July; revises procedure for filing school board candidate vacancy; and revises certain other election procedures. *
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S2086 (1R) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2086 (Same As) 2013-12-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.172.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3424 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3424_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3424_R1.HTM |