NJ S2078 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3164
Note: Carry Foward to future S2216
Note: Carry Over of previous S685
Note: Carry Over of previous A3386
Note: Carry Foward to future S2216
Note: Carry Over of previous S685
Note: Carry Over of previous A3386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2078 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2078 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1756 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S685 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
A3386 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2078 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1756 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S685 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
A3386 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2078 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2078_I1.HTM |