NJ A3386 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1756
Note: Carry Foward to future S2078
Note: Carry Over of previous S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Note: Carry Foward to future S2078
Note: Carry Over of previous S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A2922
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3386 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3386 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S685 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2922 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3386 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S685 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Ruiz)
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2922 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3386 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3386_I1.HTM |