NJ S1968 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Approved P.L.2010, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Approved P.L.2010, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain unemployment benefit claim procedures and requires registration of authorized agents of parties to the procedures.
Title
Revises certain unemployment benefit claim procedures and requires registration of authorized agents of parties to the procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-27 | Approved P.L.2010, c.82. | |
2010-10-25 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2010-10-18 | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. | |
2010-10-18 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-09-30 | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) | |
2010-08-23 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2010-06-28 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) | |
2010-06-21 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Assembly (70-9-1) | |
2010-06-21 | Motion To Table (Cryan) (47-33-0) | |
2010-06-21 | Motion To Aa (Webber) | |
2010-06-21 | Substituted for A2864 (1R) | |
2010-06-14 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by the Senate (37-1) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2864 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Substituted by S1968 (2R)