NJ S1948 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S367
Note: Carry Foward to future A2874
Note: Carry Over of previous S1070
Note: Carry Over of previous A4244
Note: Carry Foward to future A2874
Note: Carry Over of previous S1070
Note: Carry Over of previous A4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades crime of stalking when stalking activity is carried out or assisted by installation or use of communication or location monitoring program or device on cellular phone or wireless mobile device.
Title
Upgrades crime of stalking when stalking activity is carried out or assisted by installation or use of communication or location monitoring program or device on cellular phone or wireless mobile device.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1948 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1948 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2463 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1070 (Carry Over) 2018-01-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4244 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1948 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2463 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1070 (Carry Over) 2018-01-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4244 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1948 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1948_I1.HTM |