NJ S1924 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Anti-Snow Dumping Act"; prohibits commercial snowplow operators on private property from depositing snow in public roads, streets, and highways or on public lands. *
Title
"Anti-Snow Dumping Act"; prohibits commercial snowplow operators on private property from depositing snow in public roads, streets, and highways or on public lands. *
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Sen. Donald Norcross [D] |
Sen. Kevin O'Toole [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, c.110. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) | |
2011-06-23 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-23 | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) | |
2011-06-23 | Substituted for A3577 (1R) | |
2011-05-23 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3577 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S1924 (1R)