NJ S1923 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Approved P.L.2016, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in companies that boycott Israel or Israeli businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by State in companies that boycott Israel or Israeli businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-27 - General Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - General Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A925 Asaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - General Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-16SenateApproved P.L.2016, c.24.
2016-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2016-06-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2016-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-3-2)
2016-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A925 (AS/1R)
2016-06-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2016-05-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-05-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2016-05-09SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2016-05-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A925 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1923 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback