NJ A925 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1923 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by state in companies that boycott Isreal or Israeli businesses.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits investment of pension and annuity funds by state in companies that boycott Isreal or Israeli businesses.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - General Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27AssemblySubstituted by S1923 (1R)
2016-06-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2016-05-26AssemblyAssembly Substitution (Vainieri Huttle)
2016-05-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4665 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1923 (Same As) 2016-08-16 - Approved P.L.2016, c.24.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback