NJ S1895 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.26.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain school districts to submit report on nonparticipation in "Community Eligibility Provision" of National School Lunch and School Breakfast Programs.
Title
Requires certain school districts to submit report on nonparticipation in "Community Eligibility Provision" of National School Lunch and School Breakfast Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3503 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.26. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3503 |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3503 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1895