NJ S1840 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S961
Note: Carry Over of previous S961
Note: Carry Over of previous S961
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits charging fee to stop publishing personal identifying information obtained through the criminal justice system.
Title
Prohibits charging fee to stop publishing personal identifying information obtained through the criminal justice system.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Sheila Oliver [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Arthur Barclay [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2085 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2085 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.123. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A2085 (2R) |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2085 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S1840 (3R)
S961 (Carry Over) 2015-01-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S961 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S961 (Carry Over) 2015-01-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S961 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee