NJ S1814 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A774
Note: Carry Foward to future S504
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Note: Carry Over of previous S3060
Note: Carry Foward to future S504
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Note: Carry Over of previous S3060
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes payment of just compensation to businesses for losses due to public health emergency closures.
Title
Authorizes payment of just compensation to businesses for losses due to public health emergency closures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1814 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1814 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1629 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3060 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1814 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1629 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3060 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1814 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1814_I1.HTM |