NJ S1756 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3132
Note: Carry Over of previous A2891
Note: Carry Over of previous A2891
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Title
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2371 (Same As) 2023-01-19 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence