NJ A2891 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A2371
Note: Carry Foward to future S1756

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3132 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2021-12-20SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2021-12-20SenateSubstituted for S3132 (3R)
2021-12-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-12-13SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2021-02-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-22AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-10-19AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
2020-02-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S3132 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback