NJ A2371 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2249
Note: Carry Foward to future S1304
Note: Carry Over of previous A2891
Note: Carry Over of previous S3132
Note: Carry Foward to future S1304
Note: Carry Over of previous A2891
Note: Carry Over of previous S3132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Title
"Digital Asset and Blockchain Technology Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Ellen Park [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2371 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
A2371 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
S1756 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
A2371 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)
A2891 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S3132 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A2891 (4R)
S1756 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Pou)