NJ S1729 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5050
Note: Carry Over of previous S1420
Note: Carry Over of previous S1420
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to persons leasing agricultural land to beginning farmers.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to persons leasing agricultural land to beginning farmers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A286 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A5050 (Carry Over) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1420 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5050 (Carry Over) 2020-11-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1420 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1729 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1729_I1.HTM |