NJ S1654 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.251.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.251.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows NJ E-ZPass customers to opt to receive electronic notification of use of E-ZPass system at toll plazas operated by NJTA and SJTA.
Title
Allows NJ E-ZPass customers to opt to receive electronic notification of use of E-ZPass system at toll plazas operated by NJTA and SJTA.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.251. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-2-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1153 (1R) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1153 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S1654