NJ S1370 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4219
Note: Carry Over of previous A6091
Note: Carry Over of previous A6091
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "public works projects" to permit project labor agreements for more projects.
Title
Revises definition of "public works projects" to permit project labor agreements for more projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2607 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-6-8) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A2607 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-6) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2607 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S1370
S4219 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A6091 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S4219 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A6091 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee