NJ A2607 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6091
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S1370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S1370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "public works projects" to permit project labor agreements for more projects.
Title
Revises definition of "public works projects" to permit project labor agreements for more projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S1370 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1370 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A6091 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A6091 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee