NJ S1358 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.56.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns dissolution of free public libraries.
Title
Concerns dissolution of free public libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2971 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2971 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.56. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A2971 (1R) |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2971 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S1358 (SCS)