NJ S1247 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3499
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.74.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain local government utilities to impose additional connection fees; requires certain new credits and reductions for these fees.
Title
Authorizes certain local government utilities to impose additional connection fees; requires certain new credits and reductions for these fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2779 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.74. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-11-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A2779 (1R) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3499 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-12-0)
A2779 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S1247 (2R)
A2779 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S1247 (2R)