NJ S1217 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU consideration and approval of amended application for qualified wind energy project offshore in certain NJ territorial waters.
Title
Requires BPU consideration and approval of amended application for qualified wind energy project offshore in certain NJ territorial waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2485 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.21. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (57-13-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A2485 (1R) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-4) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2485 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1217 (1R)