NJ AR169 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR20
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to enact "CARE for Kids Act of 2019."
Title
Urges President and Congress to enact "CARE for Kids Act of 2019."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (72-0-5) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR169 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR84 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR84 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Filed with Secretary of State