NJ SR84 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR20
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to enact "CARE for Kids Act of 2019."
Title
Urges President and Congress to enact "CARE for Kids Act of 2019."
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR84 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR169 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR169 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State