NJ AJR91 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 27 of each year as "Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day." *
Title
Designates June 27 of each year as "Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr71 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr71 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, JR-7 |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Substituted for SJR71 (1R) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR71 (Same As) 2016-08-01 - Substituted by AJR91 (1R)