NJ AJR69 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR120
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by SJR50 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by SJR50 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April as "Genocide Awareness Month."
Title
Designates April as "Genocide Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR50 (1R) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR120 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SJR50 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-8.
SJR50 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-8.