NJ AJR55 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR175
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March of each year as "Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month."
Title
Designates March of each year as "Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR39 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR39 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, JR-2. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Substituted for SJR39 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR39 (Same As) 2018-02-26 - Substituted by AJR55
AJR175 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR175 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee