NJ A911 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A693
Note: Carry Over of previous S1097
Note: Carry Over of previous S1097
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S956 w/c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S956 w/c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends veterans' property tax exemption to tenant shareholders in cooperatives and mutual housing corporations.
Title
Extends veterans' property tax exemption to tenant shareholders in cooperatives and mutual housing corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S956 w/c |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A693 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S956 (Same As) 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.175.
S1097 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S956 (Same As) 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.175.
S1097 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee