NJ A883 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A931

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9)
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.3.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the development and posting of notices containing information for victims of human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the development and posting of notices containing information for victims of human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S280 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.3.
2020-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted for S280
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A931 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S280 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A883 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback