NJ S280 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1449

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A883 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the development and posting of notices containing information for victims of human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the development and posting of notices containing information for victims of human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted by A883 (1R)
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1449 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A883 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.3.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback