NJ A810 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1934
Note: Carry Foward to future S1307
Note: Carry Foward to future S1307
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts veterans' organizations from nonprofit corporation annual report filing fee.
Title
Exempts veterans' organizations from nonprofit corporation annual report filing fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A810 (Carry Over) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1212 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1212 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A810 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A1000/810_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A810 |