NJ A794 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4840
Note: Carry Over of previous A4840
Note: Carry Over of previous A4840
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Dept. of Agriculture and DEP to adopt coordinated permit application and review program for aquaculture projects.*
Title
Requires Dept. of Agriculture and DEP to adopt coordinated permit application and review program for aquaculture projects.*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] | Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S317 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S317 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.96. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Substituted for S317 (2R) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4840 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S317 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A794 (1R)
A4840 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Substituted by S3311 (2R)
S317 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A794 (1R)
A4840 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Substituted by S3311 (2R)