NJ S317 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3194
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A794 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Substituted by A794 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Dept. of Agriculture and DEP to adopt coordinated permit application and review program for aquaculture projects.*
Title
Requires Dept. of Agriculture and DEP to adopt coordinated permit application and review program for aquaculture projects.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Senate | Substituted by A794 (1R) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3194 (Carry Over) 2015-10-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A794 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.96.
A794 (Same As) 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.96.