NJ A4840 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A794
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Substituted by S3311 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Substituted by S3311 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires early retirement incentive offer before public safety department layoffs in municipalities in need of stabilization and recovery.
Title
Requires early retirement incentive offer before public safety department layoffs in municipalities in need of stabilization and recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Substituted by S3311 (2R) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4840 (Carry Over) 2017-07-31 - Substituted by S3311 (2R)
S3311 (Same As) 2017-08-25 - Approved P.L.2017, c.232.
S3311 (Same As) 2017-08-25 - Approved P.L.2017, c.232.