NJ A6118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3060
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Economic and Fiscal Policy Review Commission" to provide ongoing review of State and local tax structure, economic conditions, and related fiscal issues.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Economic and Fiscal Policy Review Commission" to provide ongoing review of State and local tax structure, economic conditions, and related fiscal issues.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3770 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6118 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3770
S3770 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3770 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session